Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michele Cardinal Giordano

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}

Cardinal-Priest of San Gioacchino ai Prati di Castello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1930BornSan Arcangelo
5 Jul 195322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
23 Dec 197141.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Matera, Italy
23 Dec 197141.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lari Castellum
5 Feb 197241.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lari Castellum
12 Jun 197443.7AppointedArchbishop of Matera, Italy
11 Oct 197646.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Matera e Irsina, Italy
3 Dec 197747.2AppointedArchbishop of Matera e Irsina, Italy
9 May 198756.6AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
28 Jun 198857.8Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198857.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Gioacchino ai Prati di Castello
20 May 200675.7RetiredArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
2 Dec 201080.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Giordano:
Michele Cardinal Giordano (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
  • a cardinal for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 May 2006
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 11 Oct 2014