Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dino Tomassini

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy

Bishop of Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1913Born
12 Jul 193623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Foligno, Italy
17 Aug 196249.3AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
23 Sep 196249.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
23 Aug 197057.4AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
12 Dec 197461.7AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
12 Dec 197461.7AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy
30 Jul 198067.3DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dino Tomassini
Bishop Dino Tomassini (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNocera Umbra

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 156

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018