Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Faveri

Deceased

Bishop of Tivoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1891Born
18 Dec 192029.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 May 195059.1AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
29 Jun 195059.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
27 Dec 196776.7DiedBishop of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Faveri
Bishop Luigi Faveri (born , died ) Bishop of Tivoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColle San Lorenzo

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,542
  • b: CB, 15 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast