Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Pronti

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1890BornAssisi
4 Apr 191524.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 193847.6AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
1 May 193847.7Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
1 Jan 195160.4AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy
3 Feb 197483.5DiedBishop of Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pronti:
Bishop Giuseppe Pronti (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013