Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Franchi

Deceased

Secretary of State

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1819Born
18 Dec 184122.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Mar 184222.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jun 185636.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
19 Jun 185636.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
6 Jul 185637.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
31 Oct 186041.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
13 Mar 186848.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
Jun 1869³49.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
22 Dec 187354.4Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jan 187454.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
10 Mar 187454.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
5 Mar 187858.6AppointedSecretary of State
31 Jul 187859.0DiedSecretary of State

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Franchi (VIAF: 40136558)
Alessandro Cardinal Franchi (born , died ) Secretary of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopApostolic Palace of the Quirinale, Pauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceVatican Apostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family's Tomb, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
  • a cardinal for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1873
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 550, and Page 51
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017