Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Cardoso Ayres

Deceased

Bishop of Olinda, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1821Born
5 Jun 185230.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 186745.7SelectedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
20 Dec 186746.0ConfirmedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
15 Mar 186846.2Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
14 May 187048.4DiedBishop of Olinda, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Cardoso Ayres
Bishop Francisco Cardoso Ayres (born , died ) Bishop of Olinda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRecife
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Valicelle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 17.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 424
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017