Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi (Josef) Puecher Passavalli, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Iconium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1821Born
1843¹21.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 186745.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
2 Jun 186745.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Iconium
4 Oct 189776.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Iconium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi (Josef) Puecher Passavalli (VIAF: 32874345)
Archbishop Luigi (Josef) Puecher Passavalli O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Iconium

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagliano, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception (Capuchins), Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMorrovalle, Diocese of Ancona e Numana, Italy

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1888, Page 303, and Page 304
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017