Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Morteo, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Marittima, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1831Born
1 Apr 185523.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Apr 185523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
23 Dec 187241.6AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
1 Jan 187341.6Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
21 Nov 189160.5DiedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Morteo
Bishop Giuseppe Morteo O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Massa Marittima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLivorno, Diocese of Livorno
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 371
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017