Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Carli, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Agra

Titular Bishop of Halmiros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1811BornPistoia, Italy
23 Aug 184231.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Tibet-Hindustan, India
23 Aug 184231.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Halmiros
7 May 184332.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halmiros
15 Sep 184534.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Agra, India
5 Nov 184938.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Agra, India
7 Dec 1856³45.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Agra, India
11 Dec 188776.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Agra, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Carli
Bishop Gaetano Carli O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Agra

  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 69
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016