Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Maria Cardinal Pedicini

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1769BornBenevento, Italy
19 Mar 181545.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Mar 181545.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 182353.3Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 182353.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
15 Dec 182859.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
2 Jul 183060.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
5 Jul 183060.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
15 Aug 183060.7Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
4 Feb 183161.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
21 Nov 183465.0ResignedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
19 Dec 183465.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
14 Dec 184071.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
19 Nov 184374.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maria Pedicini (VIAF: 89059777)
Carlo Maria Cardinal Pedicini (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
  • a cardinal for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1823
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016