Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Silvestro Cardinal Belli

Deceased

Bishop of Jesi

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1781BornAnagni
14 Dec 184058.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
12 Jul 184159.5Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jul 184159.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
24 Jan 184260.0AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
24 Feb 184260.1Ordained BishopBishop of Jesi, Italy
9 Sep 184462.6DiedBishop of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Silvestro Belli (VIAF: 89734157)
Silvestro Cardinal Belli (born , died ) Bishop of Jesi

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
  • a cardinal for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 61
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Dec 1840
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016