Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stefano Scerra

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ancyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1775BornCivitella d'Agliano, Italy
22 Dec 179822.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 182751.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Oropus
7 Oct 182751.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oropus
10 Apr 185175.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
20 Jan 185983.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra

MicroData Summary for Stefano Scerra
Archbishop Stefano Scerra (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Ancyra

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 99
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 292
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016