Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Concezio Pasquini

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1804BornLanciano
9 Jun 182722.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 184237.8SelectedBishop of Squillace, Italy
22 Jul 184238.0ConfirmedBishop of Squillace, Italy
24 Jul 184238.0Ordained BishopBishop of Squillace, Italy
9 Dec 185753.4SelectedBishop of Ariano, Italy
21 Dec 185753.4ConfirmedBishop of Ariano, Italy
9 Jan 185853.5DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Concezio Pasquini:
Bishop Concezio Pasquini (born , died ) Bishop of Ariano

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 121
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 352

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013