Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia

Dioecesis Arianensis Hirpina-Laquedoniensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Sergio Melillo, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • United: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Benevento
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 781 (301 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Campania
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesiarianolacedonia.it/
  • Mailing Address: Vescovado, Piazza Plebiscito 13, 83031 Ariano Irpino [Avellino], Italia
  • Telephone: 0825.87.11.39
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ariano
11th CenturyErectedDiocese of Ariano (erected)
2 July 1953Territory LostDiocese of Ariano (Corsaro with Castello Corsaro, the Contrada of S. Giacomo and the Contrada of Corsaro along with S. Nicolai) Archdiocese of Benevento
2 July 1953Territory AddedArchdiocese of Benevento (S. Maria ad Nives in Morrone in Bonito) Diocese of Ariano
15 November 1977Territory LostDiocese of Ariano (Monteleone) Diocese of Bovino
15 November 1977Territory AddedDiocese of Bovino (Montaguto) Diocese of Ariano
Diocese of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of Ariano
Diocese of Lacedonia
Diocese of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia
6 March 1997Territory LostDiocese of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia (Santa Maria Maggiore (Sant'Arcangelo Trimonte)) Archdiocese of Benevento
6 March 1997Territory AddedArchdiocese of Benevento (San Bartolomeo Apostolo (Greci), San Nicola Vescovo (Savignano Irpino), and Santa Maria del Monte Carmelo (Savignano Irpino)) Diocese of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia
25 January 1998Territory AddedDiocese of Avellino (S. Maria di Carpignano (Carpignano frazione di Grottaminarda) and Santa Maria Maggiore (Grottaminarda))
Archdiocese of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia (San Bartolomeo Apostolo (Vallata))
Diocese of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia
25 January 1998Territory LostDiocese of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia (S. Nicola di Bari (Buonalbergo)) Archdiocese of Benevento

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ariano
188644,728.0%144023OTC
195062,00062,40699.3%399481,291109624ap1951
195963,30063,50099.7%3310431,4721211230ap1960
196963,30063,50099.7%3115461,376167824ap1971
198042,80043,00099.5%21212,0387230ap1981
Diocese of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia
199064,72864,92699.7%3319521,244208235ap1991
199971,00071,17799.8%3611471,510146343ap2000
200069,71170,61198.7%3713501,394167143ap2001
200169,74570,74898.6%3110411,701136743ap2002
200269,23669,59999.5%3711481,442147043ap2003
200371,32971,94299.1%3911501,426146843ap2004
200472,90274,05598.4%3813511,429166343ap2005
200673,52474,20099.1%571875980205443ap2007
201274,00074,75099.0%4111521,4238137043ap2013
201565,80066,50098.9%3610461,4308127143ap2016
201863,43064,03099.1%419501,2688115743ap2019
202061,00061,53099.1%429511,1967114643ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Ariano
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 106
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 94
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 117
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 94, and Page 95
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 98, and Page 99
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 99, and Page 100
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 89
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 121
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 67
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 852, to Page 853
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 46, Page 65, and Page 66
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 70, Page 132, and Page 133
  • Diocese of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 651, to Page 653
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 90, Page 58, to Page 60
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 90, Page 238, to Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 26 Jul 2023