Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Maria Aguilar, B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1814Born
16 Oct 183622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
27 Oct 187157.5AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
1 Nov 187157.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
17 Sep 187561.4AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
21 Jan 189277.7DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Aguilar (VIAF: 88965553)
Archbishop Luigi Maria Aguilar B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopS. Charles ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 121, and Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017