Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Papardo del Parco, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1819Born
11 Dec 185738.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Messina, Italy
11 Dec 185738.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinope
31 Jan 185838.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinope
27 Oct 187152.1AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
3 Aug 188363.8DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Papardo del Parco (VIAF: 89313606)
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Papardo del Parco C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina
Ordained BishopS. Andre della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 395, and Page 380
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 519
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017