Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Fanža, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1804Born
3 May 182723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
27 Mar 186763.1AppointedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
7 Apr 186763.1Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
23 Jan 188075.9DiedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Fanža (VIAF: 102579542)
Bishop Antonio Maria Fanža O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRignano Garganico, Archdiocese of Manfredonia
Ordained BishopS. Maria in ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 369
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1867, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Feb 2017