Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo

Archidioecesis Sipontinus-Vestanus-Sancti Ioannis Rotundi



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Michele Castoro, Archbishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Manfredonia
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Manfredonia (erected)
Archdiocese of Manfredonia
1074ElevatedDiocese of Manfredonia Archdiocese of Manfredonia
Archdiocese of Manfredonia (e Vieste)
27 June 1818UnitedArchdiocese of Manfredonia
Diocese of Vieste (suppressed)
Archdiocese of Manfredonia (e Vieste)
30 April 1979ElevatedArchdiocese of Manfredonia (e Vieste) (no longer a Metropolitan)
Archdiocese of Manfredonia-Vieste
30 September 1986Name ChangedArchdiocese of Manfredonia (e Vieste) Archdiocese of Manfredonia-Vieste
Archdiocese of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo
6 December 2002Name ChangedArchdiocese of Manfredonia-Vieste Archdiocese of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Manfredonia (e Vieste)
1950111,903112,04099.9%7617931,203245616ap1951
1970142,000143,00099.3%77461231,1545620544ap1971
1980148,000152,00097.4%74481221,2135516849ap1981
Archdiocese of Manfredonia-Vieste
1990148,750157,70094.3%79501291,1535719346ap1991
1999153,700156,78898.0%70591291,1916920947ap2000
2000153,600156,64298.1%71511221,2596222448ap2001
2001153,300156,45098.0%72501221,2565820648ap2002
Archdiocese of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo
2002152,400154,41398.7%74571311,16326321549ap2003
2003153,200155,21698.7%72611331,15126520649ap2004
2004152,800154,90698.6%72541261,21226119949ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Nov 2013