Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Borgia

Apostolic Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire

Titular Archbishop of Milazzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1966 Born
10 Apr 199933.0Ordained PriestPriest of Manfredonia-Vieste, Italy
3 Sep 201953.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
3 Sep 201953.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Milazzo
4 Oct 201953.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Milazzo
28 Oct 201953.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Paolo Borgia
Archbishop Paolo Borgia (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Côte d’Ivoire

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManfredonia, Archdiocese of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Côte d’Ivoire.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Sep 2019
  • c34: CB, 4 Oct 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,250
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 28 Oct 2019

Quantcast