Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Cortesi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Poland

Titular Archbishop of Siraces


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1876Born
18 Dec 189923.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 192144.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
13 Jun 192144.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Siraces
21 Aug 192144.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Siraces
19 Oct 192650.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina
14 Jun 192851.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
4 Jun 193659.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
18 Jul 193659.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
24 Dec 193660.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
1 Feb 194770.3DiedApostolic Nuncio to Poland

MicroData Summary for Filippo Cortesi (VIAF: 165629510)
Archbishop Filippo Cortesi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Poland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlia, Diocese of Cefalù, Italy
Death PlaceGrottaferrata

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 61
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 42, and Page 200, and Page 210
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 241, and Page 263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 May 2018

Quantcast