Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Esandi, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Viedma, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1876Born
28 Jan 190023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Sep 193457.7AppointedBishop of Viedma, Argentina
17 Feb 193558.1Ordained BishopBishop of Viedma, Argentina
18 Mar 193558.2InstalledBishop of Viedma, Argentina
29 Aug 194871.7DiedBishop of Viedma, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Esandi
Bishop Nicolás Esandi S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Viedma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBahia Blanca

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018