Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Córdoba

Archidioecesis Cordubensis in Argentina



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 April 1934
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 19,722 (7,617 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arzobispadocba.org.ar/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Avda. Hipolito Irigoyen 98, X5000JHN Cordoba, Argentina
  • Telephone: (0351)422.10.15
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán)
10 May 1570ErectedDiocese of Santiago de Chile (Tucumán) Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán) (erected)
28 March 1806Territory LostDiocese of Córdoba (Tucumán) Diocese of Salta (erected)
1826Territory LostDiocese of Córdoba (Tucumán) Vicariate Apostolic of San Juan de Cuyo (erected)
20 April 1934Territory LostDiocese of Córdoba (Tucumán) Diocese of Río Cuarto (erected)
20 April 1934Territory LostDiocese of Córdoba (Tucumán) Diocese of La Rioja (erected)
Archdiocese of Córdoba
20 April 1934ElevatedDiocese of Córdoba (Tucumán) Archdiocese of Córdoba
11 February 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Córdoba Diocese of Villa María (erected)
10 April 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Córdoba Diocese of San Francisco (erected)
12 August 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Córdoba Diocese of Cruz del Eje (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Córdoba
1950990,0001,170,00084.6%1751943692,6823271,15987ap1951
1963908,000.0%126224350052ap1967
19701,000,0001,200,00083.3%1442203642,7476701,40570ap1971
19761,150,0001,400,00082.1%1262103363,422135993092ap1977
19801,215,0001,519,00080.0%1022283303,681244798399ap1981
19901,400,0001,671,00083.8%1402043444,069482866107ap1991
19991,681,0001,868,00090.0%1751813564,7212389809114ap2000
20001,685,0001,872,83390.0%1751763514,8002373809114ap2001
20011,685,0001,872,83390.0%1731743474,8553365809114ap2002
20021,613,1361,792,90490.0%1731743474,6483361809114ap2003
20031,667,4501,852,72190.0%1711743454,8333355772114ap2004
20041,797,3001,997,24390.0%1641743385,3173355772114ap2005
20061,814,0002,016,00090.0%1701743445,2732355772114ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 21 Jan 2014