Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Trujillo

Archidioecesis Truxillensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 23 May 1943
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 15,323 (5,918 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Jr. Mariscal de Orbegoso 451, Trujillo 3102, Peru
  • Telephone: (44)256.812; 201.961
  • Fax: 231.473

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Trujillo
15 April 1577ErectedArchdiocese of Lima Diocese of Trujillo (erected)
28 May 1803Territory LostDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
Diocese of Cuenca
Archdiocese of Lima
Diocese of Popayán
Diocese of Quito
Diocese of Trujillo
Diocese of Maynas (erected)
5 April 1908Territory LostDiocese of Chachapoyas
Diocese of Trujillo
Diocese of Cajamarca (erected)
29 February 1940Territory LostDiocese of Trujillo Diocese of Piura (erected)
Archdiocese of Trujillo
23 May 1943ElevatedDiocese of Trujillo Archdiocese of Trujillo
17 December 1956Territory LostDiocese of Cajamarca
Archdiocese of Trujillo
Diocese of Chiclayo (erected)
4 December 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Trujillo Territorial Prelature of Huamachuco (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Trujillo
1950792,000800,00099.0%4341849,428399553ap1951
1966420,000480,00087.5%62481103,8185817535ap1967
1968640,000650,00098.5%64581225,2457120436ap1971
1976710,000750,00094.7%3250828,6586025046ap1977
1980796,000857,00092.9%35397410,75614716047ap1981
1990960,0001,100,00087.3%54328611,16216520347ap1991
19991,273,3001,391,12091.5%584210012,73311222050ap2000
2000956,4151,141,15083.8%65441098,77411517452ap2001
2001933,8331,081,72186.3%64531177,98111216257ap2002
2002933,8331,229,04576.0%64531177,98112116258ap2003
2003946,1671,244,04976.1%66491158,22711216561ap2004
20041,078,5481,315,30282.0%65461119,71612917161ap2005
20101,149,0001,374,00083.6%64621269,11911918969ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 1 Nov 2014