Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Díaz de Cienfuegos

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652²BornTuna
12 Aug 168634.6AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
20 Dec 169241.0Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
20 Feb 169644.1AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
9 Jan 170250.0DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Díaz de Cienfuegos:
Bishop Pedro Díaz de Cienfuegos (died ) Bishop of Trujillo

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 320, and Page 392
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 234, Number 1,452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013