Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Popayán

Archidioecesis Popayanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 June 1900
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 17,087 (6,599 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Apartado aereo 593, Calle 5 N. 6-71, Popayan, Colombia
  • Telephone: (028) 24-1710
  • Fax: 24-0101

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Popayán
22 August 1546ErectedDiocese of Panamá Diocese of Popayán (erected)
28 May 1803Territory LostDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
Diocese of Cuenca
Archdiocese of Lima
Diocese of Popayán
Diocese of Quito
Diocese of Trujillo
Diocese of Maynas (erected)
31 August 1804Territory LostDiocese of Cartagena
Diocese of Popayán
Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Diocese of Antioquía (erected)
10 April 1859Territory LostDiocese of Popayán Diocese of Pasto (erected)
1894Territory LostDiocese of Popayán
Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Diocese of Tolima (erected)
Archdiocese of Popayán
20 June 1900ElevatedDiocese of Popayán Archdiocese of Popayán
7 June 1910Territory LostArchdiocese of Popayán Diocese of Cali (erected)
13 May 1921Territory LostArchdiocese of Popayán Prefecture Apostolic of Tierradentro (erected)
17 December 1952Territory LostDiocese of Cali
Archdiocese of Popayán
Diocese of Palmira (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Popayán
1950650,000650,50099.9%95291245,2419439954ap1951
1966450,000500,00090.0%828905,0002625849ap1967
1970620,800629,00098.7%6821896,9754622550ap1971
1976555,000620,00089.5%6524896,2355346556ap1977
1980740,452797,15192.9%5722799,3724741758ap1981
1990735,000749,00098.1%5740977,57737034659ap1991
19991,044,9271,080,56796.7%84401248,42656932068ap2000
20001,015,7421,098,09992.5%88351238,25846332070ap2001
20011,082,9571,128,08096.0%88321209,02446238870ap2002
20021,097,6081,143,50096.0%116321487,41645538874ap2003
20031,112,2591,165,50095.4%104361407,94446340075ap2004
20041,100,0001,160,07194.8%102471497,38247033176ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014