Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de la Serna, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1568²BornHuanuco, Peru
9 Jun 159628.4ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
17 Dec 163568.0AppointedBishop of Paraguay
25 Aug 163769.6AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
15 Nov 163769.9Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
19 Jan 164577.0SelectedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
21 Aug 164577.6ConfirmedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
Apr 1647³79.3DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de la Serna:
Bishop Francisco de la Serna O.S.A. , Bishop of La Paz

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 98, and Page 269
  • bd/bp/ob/c2: CB, 20 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014