Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Quito

Archidioecesis Quitensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 13 January 1848
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ecuador
  • Square Kilometers: 11,167 (4,313 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesisdequito.ec/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 17-01-00106, Calle Chile OE4-22 y Venezuela, Quito, Ecuador
  • Telephone: (02)2284.429
  • Fax: 2580.973

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Quito
8 January 1546ErectedDiocese of Lima Diocese of Quito (erected)
1 July 1786Territory LostDiocese of Quito Diocese of Cuenca (erected)
28 May 1803Territory LostDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
Diocese of Cuenca
Archdiocese of Lima
Diocese of Popayán
Diocese of Quito
Diocese of Trujillo
Diocese of Maynas (erected)
29 January 1838Territory LostDiocese of Quito Diocese of Guayaquil (erected)
Archdiocese of Quito
13 January 1848ElevatedDiocese of Quito Archdiocese of Quito
29 December 1862Territory LostArchdiocese of Quito Diocese of Ibarra (erected)
23 March 1870Territory LostDiocese of Guayaquil
Archdiocese of Quito
Diocese of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio) (erected)
7 February 1871Territory LostArchdiocese of Quito Vicariate Apostolic of Napo (erected)
28 February 1948Territory LostArchdiocese of Quito Diocese of Ambato (erected)
5 December 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Quito Diocese of Latacunga (erected)
5 January 1987Territory LostArchdiocese of Quito Territorial Prelature of Santo Domingo de los Colorados (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Quito
1950564,000565,55099.7%1281903181,77350086466ap1951
1966682,997682,997100.0%1342884221,6186231,33273ap1967
1968770,000779,56498.8%1522874391,7537281,26387ap1971
1976910,8271,001,98090.9%1402804202,1685261,37692ap1977
19801,164,0001,293,00090.0%1322784102,8394651,457100ap1981
19901,338,4821,487,20790.0%1383134512,96746701,419118ap1991
19991,786,5001,985,00090.0%1742904643,85056641,751150ap2000
20002,014,0002,120,00095.0%1522784304,68346571,837159ap2001
20012,010,0002,250,00089.3%1712844554,41746681,853159ap2002
20021,845,0002,050,00090.0%1882804683,94236392,201163ap2003
20031,886,4002,096,00090.0%1922794714,00537031,987165ap2004
20041,893,2952,103,66190.0%1842724564,15136941,843165ap2005
20102,115,0002,350,00090.0%1792544334,88427971,542173ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Aug 2014