Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Cuero y Caicedo

Deceased

Bishop of Quito


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1735³BornCali
3 Jul 179862.8AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
1799²63.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
23 Dec 180166.2AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
10 Dec 181580.2DiedBishop of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Cuero y Caicedo
Bishop José Cuero y Caicedo (born , died ) Bishop of Quito

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 178
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 316
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1799, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016