Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Miguel Carrión y Valdivieso

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Quito

Titular Bishop of Botrys


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1783³BornLoja
15 Dec 180521.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Quito, Ecuador
13 Apr 180622.3Ordained PriestPriest of Quito, Ecuador
27 Apr 184056.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
27 Apr 184056.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
8 May 184258.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
1848¹64.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Miguel Carrión y Valdivieso
Bishop José Miguel Carrión y Valdivieso (born , died 1848) Auxiliary Bishop of Quito

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 116
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016