Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Jiménez y Padilla

Deceased

Bishop of Popayán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1765BornMálaga, Spain
1793¹27.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 181650.2AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
21 Jul 181650.6Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
13 Feb 184175.2DiedBishop of Popayán, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvador Jiménez y Padilla:
Bishop Salvador Jiménez y Padilla (born , died ) Bishop of Popayán

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 312
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 134, Number 718

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015