Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Estévez

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1780¹BornBucaramanga
21 May 182747.3AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
17 Feb 182848.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
15 Oct 183454.7DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
19 Dec 183454.9AppointedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for José María Estévez
Bishop José María Estévez (born 1780, died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 80, and Page 255
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016