Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Fernández de Sotomayor y Picón

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1777¹BornCartagena
16 Jan 180124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cartagena, Colombia
29 Apr 183154.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cartagena, Colombia
29 Apr 183154.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
1 Nov 183154.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
19 Dec 183457.9AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
29 Mar 184972.2DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Fernández de Sotomayor y Picón (VIAF: 250364863)
Bishop Juan Fernández de Sotomayor y Picón (born 1777, died ) Bishop of Cartagena

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 136, and Page 237
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 23
  • bp/bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016