Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Cabarcas González y Argüello

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1774BornPuerto Alegre
16 Jan 180025.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 183561.2AppointedBishop of Panamá
19 Mar 183661.8Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
16 Apr 184772.9DiedBishop of Panamá

MicroData Summary for Juan José Cabarcas González y Argüello:
Bishop Juan José Cabarcas González y Argüello (born , died ) Bishop of Panamá

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 297

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013