Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Panamá

Archidioecesis Panamensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 29 November 1925
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Panama
  • Square Kilometers: 13,275 (5,127 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arpa.org.pa/
  • Mailing Address: Calle 1a Sur Carrasquilla, Apartado 6386, Panamá 5, Panamá
  • Telephone: 261-0002
  • Fax: 261-0820

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Santa María de La Antigua del Darién
28 August 1513ErectedDiocese of Santa María de La Antigua del Darién (erected) (Suffragan of Seville, Spain)
Diocese of Panamá
7 December 1520Name ChangedDiocese of Santa María de La Antigua del Darién Diocese of Panamá
24 April 1534Territory LostDiocese of Panamá Diocese of Cartagena (erected)
3 November 1534Territory LostDiocese of Panamá Diocese of Nicaragua (erected)
12 February 1546Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Panamá (From Sevilla (Spain) to Lima (Peru))
22 August 1546Territory LostDiocese of Panamá Diocese of Popayán (erected)
22 April 1836Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Panamá (from Lima (Peru) to Bogot  (Columbia))
1901Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Panamá (from Bogot  (Columbia) to Cartagena)
29 November 1925Territory LostDiocese of Panamá Vicariate Apostolic of Darién (erected)
Archdiocese of Panamá
29 November 1925ElevatedDiocese of Panamá Archdiocese of Panamá
6 March 1955ElevatedArchdiocese of Panamá (becomes a Metropolitan)
6 March 1955Territory LostArchdiocese of Panamá Diocese of David (erected)
21 July 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Panamá Diocese of Chitré (erected)
13 July 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Panamá Diocese of Santiago de Veraguas (erected)
18 December 1993Territory LostArchdiocese of Panamá Diocese of Penonomé (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Panamá
1949530,000550,00096.4%3661975,4639521550ap1951
1966541,135584,60092.6%35931284,2272144ap1967
1970659,000689,20095.6%50951454,54410914646ap1971
1976798,606887,34090.0%471051525,25313830356ap1977
1980898,299998,11090.0%411161575,721717029061ap1981
19901,132,8401,258,71390.0%721131856,1231919831389ap1991
1999985,0001,094,00090.0%62861486,6555211533185ap2000
20001,299,0001,444,00090.0%861272136,0985118233187ap2001
20011,299,0001,444,00090.0%911272185,9585115633187ap2002
2002633,705704,11790.0%911122033,1215214221886ap2003
2003633,705704,11790.0%871121993,1845215621886ap2004
2004633,705704,11790.0%801171973,2164816121888ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 30 Dec 2013