Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agustín Rodríguez Delgado

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1674BornOropesa, Spain
19 Dec 172551.2AppointedBishop of Panamá
8 Sep 172651.9Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
17 Dec 173157.2AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
5 Dec 174167.1SelectedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
22 Jan 174267.2ConfirmedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
2 Mar 174671.4SelectedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
14 Jun 174671.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
18 Dec 174672.2DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Agustín Rodríguez Delgado:
Archbishop Agustín Rodríguez Delgado (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,543
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 43, Number 167
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 53
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 305
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 261, and Page 323
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 341

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015