Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diego Cardinal Astorga y Céspedes

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1666Born
17 Dec 168923.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 171649.4AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
14 Jun 171649.6Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
22 Jul 172053.7AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
26 Nov 172761.1Elevated to Cardinal
9 Feb 173467.3DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Astorga y Céspedes (VIAF: 169410592)
Diego Cardinal Astorga y Céspedes (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGibraltar
Ordained BishopSan Patricio, Church, Lorca

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
  • a cardinal for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1727
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 34, Number 106
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 114, and Page 383
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,524
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,950
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,515

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 27 Oct 2020

Quantcast