Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Pisani

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1494²BornVenice
1 Jul 151723.5Elevated to Cardinal
22 Oct 151824.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro
8 Aug 152430.6AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
28 Sep 152632.7AppointedAdministrator of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
3 May 152733.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
5 May 152733.3Ordained BishopBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
27 Jan 152834.1AppointedAdministrator of Treviso, Italy
27 Feb 152834.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
24 May 152935.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
10 May 153541.4ResignedAdministrator of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
20 Feb 153844.1ResignedAdministrator of Treviso, Italy
4 May 154147.3ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
9 Jan 154551.0ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
28 Feb 155056.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
11 May 155157.4AppointedAdministrator of Narbonne, France
155561.0ResignedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
29 May 155561.4ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
29 May 155561.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
20 Sep 155763.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
18 May 156268.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
8 Oct 156369.8ResignedAdministrator of Narbonne, France
12 May 156470.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
21 Jun 156470.5ResignedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
28 Jun 157076.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pisani:
Cardinal Francesco Pisani (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 43.1 years
  • a cardinal for 53.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,627
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 309, and Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013