Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel José de Hendaya y Haro

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1686¹BornManila, Philippines
11 Sep 172438.6AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
29 Oct 172438.8Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
5 Oct 172943.7DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel José de Hendaya y Haro:
Bishop Manuel José de Hendaya y Haro (born 1686, died ) Bishop of Oviedo

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 300
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 42, Number 158
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015