Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Asensio Barrios, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619¹BornGibraltar
1643²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
9 Sep 166950.7AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
24 May 167051.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
26 Jun 167354.5AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
20 Apr 168263.3AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
17 Jun 169273.5DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Asensio Barrios:
Bishop Juan Asensio Barrios O. de M. (died ) Bishop of Jaén

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 65, and Page 210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 247
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 205, Number 1,283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014