Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Seijas Losada

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615²BornCabañas
1640²25.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 166449.5AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
20 Jun 167055.5AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
28 Apr 168166.3AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
26 Oct 168469.8DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Seijas Losada:
Archbishop Francisco de Seijas Losada (died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 199, Number 1,245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013