Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diego Cardinal Guzmán de Haros

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566²BornOcaña
14 Mar 161650.2AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
18 Apr 161650.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
9 Sep 162559.7SelectedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
15 Sep 162559.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
19 Nov 162963.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Jul 163064.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jan 163165.1DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Guzmán de Haros:
Cardinal Diego Guzmán de Haros (died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a cardinal for 1.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Nov 1629
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 133, Number 854
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 204, and Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 28 Dec 2013