Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Andrade Sotomayor

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1579²BornVillagarcía de Arosa
29 May 162849.4AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
10 Sep 162849.7Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
10 Nov 163152.9AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
10 Sep 164061.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Sigüenza, Spain
20 Mar 164566.2AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
21 Jan 165576.1DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Andrade Sotomayor:
Archbishop Fernando Andrade Sotomayor (died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 124, and Page 311
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 158, and Page 271
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 151, Number 957

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014