Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Burgos

Archidioecesis Burgensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Francisco Gil Hellín, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 22 October 1574
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Spain
  • Square Kilometers: 13,849 (5,349 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archiburgos.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Calle Eduardo Martinez del Campo 7, Apartado 3, 09003 Burgos, Espana
  • Telephone: 947.20.84.40
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Burgos
1075ErectedDiocese of Burgos (erected)
Archdiocese of Burgos
22 October 1574ElevatedDiocese of Burgos Archdiocese of Burgos
12 December 1754Territory LostArchdiocese of Burgos Diocese of Santander (erected)
8 September 1861Territory LostArchdiocese of Burgos
Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Diocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
Diocese of Santander
Diocese of Vitoria (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Burgos
1950581,090581,097100.0%7081788866557081,1301,091ap1951
1959400,125400,130100.0%6682859534199281,315990ap1960
1969357,356357,368100.0%6982419393807741,835441ap1971
1978338,219339,05399.8%5682027704395701,549998ap1981
1990336,206355,28794.6%4952006954835751,469996ap1991
1999334,200345,43096.7%4551516065513821,255999ap2000
2000334,178345,87296.6%4541476015563671,087999ap2001
2001336,000343,72297.8%44515660155913961,249999ap2002
2002335,743349,72296.0%44116260355614161,261999ap2003
2003335,743349,72296.0%4311515825763651,2271,001ap2004
2004337,445355,20595.0%4311465775843321,2641,001ap2005
2006339,360361,02194.0%4191575765894011,3011,001ap2007
2012339,185375,56390.3%3851535386303201,1761,003ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014