Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Cob García

Vicar Apostolic of Puyo

Titular Bishop of Cerbali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1951 BornLa Horra, Spain
23 Oct 197625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Burgos, Spain
28 Nov 199847.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Puyo, Ecuador
28 Nov 199847.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cerbali
6 Jan 199947.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cerbali

MicroData Summary for Rafael Cob García:
Bishop Rafael Cob García (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Puyo

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Puyo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,459

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013