Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Puyo

Apostolicus Vicariatus Puyoënsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Rafael Cob García, Vicar Apostolic
  • Frumencio Escudero Arenas, Vicar Apostolic Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 18 May 1976
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ecuador
  • Square Kilometers: 31,000 (11,973 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Mision Dominicana, Apartado 16-01-749, Calle 10 de Agosto 864, Puyo, Pastaza, Ecuador
  • Telephone: (033)288.51.66; 288.55.25
  • Fax: 288.51.68

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Canelos e Macas
4 October 1886ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Napo Prefecture Apostolic of Canelos e Macas (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Canelos
19 February 1930Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Canelos e Macas Prefecture Apostolic of Canelos
Vicariate Apostolic of Canelos
29 September 1964ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Canelos Vicariate Apostolic of Canelos
Vicariate Apostolic of Puyo
18 May 1976Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Canelos Vicariate Apostolic of Puyo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Canelos
195015,00022,00068.2%553,0001367ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Canelos
19654,0008,00050.0%1010400146ap1967
197018,000.0%9902115ap1971
Vicariate Apostolic of Puyo
197624,20028,00086.4%554,84014227ap1977
198025,20029,80084.6%664,200111312ap1981
199035,00040,00087.5%4593,888113514ap1991
199959,00072,00081.9%83115,36385210ap2000
200059,97973,00082.2%83115,45285611ap2001
200161,02174,04282.4%102125,08584811ap2002
200253,56068,00078.8%122143,825184511ap2003
200354,45959,91790.9%121134,189154217ap2004
200455,06861,77989.1%92115,00665217ap2005
201061,10067,80090.1%125173,59495623ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011