Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Zambrano Palacios, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Loja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1920BornLoja
3 Dec 194424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Jan 195938.7AppointedPrefect of Canelos, Ecuador
29 Sep 196444.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
29 Sep 196444.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Canelos, Ecuador
3 Dec 196444.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
11 Dec 197252.6AppointedBishop of Loja, Ecuador
2 May 198565.0ResignedBishop of Loja, Ecuador
22 Aug 199474.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Loja, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Alberto Zambrano Palacios:
Bishop Alberto Zambrano Palacios O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Loja

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1962
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013