Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James William Gleeson

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Adelaide


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1920BornBalaklava
25 Jul 194524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Adelaide, Australia
15 Feb 195736.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Adelaide, Australia
15 Feb 195736.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sesta
21 May 195736.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sesta
6 Jul 196443.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Adelaide, Australia
6 Jul 196443.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aurusuliana
1 May 197150.4SucceededArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia
19 Jun 198564.5ResignedArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia
21 Mar 200079.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Adelaide, Australia

MicroData Summary for James William Gleeson:
Archbishop James William Gleeson (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Adelaide

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013