Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Patrick Moran

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne

Titular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1907BornOakleigh
26 Jul 193629.0Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
9 Nov 196457.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
9 Nov 196457.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
3 Dec 196457.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
15 Mar 197062.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Patrick Moran:
Bishop Lawrence Patrick Moran (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013