Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Desmond Charles Moore, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alotau-Sideia, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1926Born
27 Jul 195731.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
7 Mar 197043.8AppointedBishop of Alotau-Sideia, Papua New Guinea
2 Jul 197044.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alotau-Sideia, Papua New Guinea
15 Jun 200175.0RetiredBishop of Alotau-Sideia, Papua New Guinea
2 Jun 202094.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Alotau-Sideia, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Desmond Charles Moore
Bishop Desmond Charles Moore M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alotau-Sideia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThebarton, Australia
Ordained BishopSainte Marie, Cathedral, Port Moresby, Archdiocese of Port Moresby
Death PlaceSydney, Archdiocese of Sydney, Australia

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 49.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: CB, 2 May 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 613
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • d: CB, 2 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 19 Jun 2020

Quantcast