Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Duhig

Deceased

Archbishop of Brisbane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1871BornKillila, Broadford, Ireland
19 Sep 189625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
16 Sep 190534.0AppointedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
10 Dec 190534.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
27 Feb 191240.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Brisbane, Australia
27 Feb 191240.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amida
13 Jan 191745.4SucceededArchbishop of Brisbane, Australia
10 Apr 196593.6DiedArchbishop of Brisbane, Australia

MicroData Summary for James Duhig:
Archbishop James Duhig (born , died ) Archbishop of Brisbane

  • a priest for 68.6 years
  • a bishop for 59.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 51, and Page 92
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013